NY S06715 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the peer-to-peer car sharing program act, which provides guidelines for establishing peer-to-peer car sharing programs and outlines how they shall be insured, which cars shall be used, how drivers shall work under such programs, and how liability should be determined under such programs in the case of an accident or damaged property.
Title
Enacts the peer-to-peer car sharing program act, which provides guidelines for establishing peer-to-peer car sharing programs and outlines how they shall be insured, which cars shall be used, how drivers shall work under such programs, and how liability should be determined under such programs in the case of an accident or damaged property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.147 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.795 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.537 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a2349a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1169 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02349 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6715