NY S06735 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - SIGNED CHAP.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - SIGNED CHAP.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to persons joining certain public retirement systems after April 1, 2012.
Title
Relates to persons joining certain public retirement systems after April 1, 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.18 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.20 |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | substituted for a9558 |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-03-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-14 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2012-03-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.368 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09558 (Same As) 2012-03-15 - substituted by s6735