NY S06737 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from prospective employees; establishes a public awareness campaign.
Title
Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from prospective employees; establishes a public awareness campaign.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6737A |
2017-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02040 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR