NY S06800 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - referred to small business
Pending: Assembly Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the division for small-business to publish a small business compliance guide and post such guide to the division for small-business's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the division for small-business to publish a small business compliance guide and post such guide to the division for small-business's website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11Assemblyreferred to small business
2020-03-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-03-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-03-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-03-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-03-03Senate1ST REPORT CAL.532
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2019-11-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 6800A
2019-11-15SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2019-10-23SenateREFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback