NY S06901 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization granted to the county of Montgomery to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use taxes to November 30, 2025.
Title
Extends the authorization granted to the county of Montgomery to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use taxes to November 30, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.273 |
2023-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.547 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a7253 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1402 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07253 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - substituted by s6901