NY S06991 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strengthens protections for patients regarding sexual misconduct by medical providers; requires medical expert consultants involved in investigations disclose conflicts of interest and to not be under investigation, on warning, or on probation; requires a zero tolerance policy to be adopted and training to be provided on sexual misconduct by the board for professional misconduct; includes provisions related to the right to have a chaperone; includes sexual misconduct in the definition of professional misconduct.
Title
Strengthens protections for patients regarding sexual misconduct by medical providers; requires medical expert consultants involved in investigations disclose conflicts of interest and to not be under investigation, on warning, or on probation; requires a zero tolerance policy to be adopted and training to be provided on sexual misconduct by the board for professional misconduct; includes provisions related to the right to have a chaperone; includes sexual misconduct in the definition of professional misconduct.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6991A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08068 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to health