NY S07007 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.564
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.564
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the public service commission to conduct a study on gas and electric supply prices during the time period commencing on November 1, 2013 and ending on April 30th, 2014.
Title
Directs the public service commission to conduct a study on gas and electric supply prices during the time period commencing on November 1, 2013 and ending on April 30th, 2014.
Sponsors
Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.564 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.864 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a9503a |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 7007A |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.958 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09503 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - substituted by s7007a