NY S07023 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strengthens protections for patients regarding sexual misconduct by medical providers; requires medical expert consultants involved in investigations disclose conflicts of interest and to not be under investigation, on warning, or on probation; requires a zero-tolerance policy to be adopted and training to be provided on sexual misconduct by the board for professional misconduct; includes provisions related to the right to have a chaperone; includes sexual misconduct in the definition of professional misconduct.
Title
Strengthens protections for patients regarding sexual misconduct by medical providers; requires medical expert consultants involved in investigations disclose conflicts of interest and to not be under investigation, on warning, or on probation; requires a zero-tolerance policy to be adopted and training to be provided on sexual misconduct by the board for professional misconduct; includes provisions related to the right to have a chaperone; includes sexual misconduct in the definition of professional misconduct.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.835 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7023A |
2024-03-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08196 (Same As) 2024-03-19 - print number 8196a