NY S07053 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9646A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9646A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the building inspector in the town of Wilson, county of Niagara to reside outside of such town.
Title
Relates to authorizing the building inspector in the town of Wilson, county of Niagara to reside outside of such town.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9646A |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7053A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.941 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09646 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.136