NY S07082 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the video recording of interrogations of juveniles in juvenile delinquency proceedings in family court.
Title
Relates to requiring the video recording of interrogations of juveniles in juvenile delinquency proceedings in family court.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1576 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7082A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09770 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.356