NY S07112 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes domestic companion animals be permitted to board any public transportation or public transportation service in the event of a state of emergency and evacuation.
Title
Authorizes domestic companion animals be permitted to board any public transportation or public transportation service in the event of a state of emergency and evacuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.284 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.908 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | substituted for a4956 |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-01-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.147 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04956 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - substituted by s7112