NY S07125 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 7125A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 7125A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits mortgagees from requiring mortgagors of certain residential real property to purchase flood insurance exceeding a coverage amount that exceeds the balance as of the beginning of the year for which the policy shall be in effect, or that includes coverage for contents.
Title
Prohibits mortgagees from requiring mortgagors of certain residential real property to purchase flood insurance exceeding a coverage amount that exceeds the balance as of the beginning of the year for which the policy shall be in effect, or that includes coverage for contents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7125A |
2024-04-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05073 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY