NY S07140 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to disability retirement benefits for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, undersheriffs and correction officers in Nassau County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to disability retirement benefits for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, undersheriffs and correction officers in Nassau County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.317
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.175
2018-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a9010
2018-05-01Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2018-05-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-02-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-01-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.303
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09010 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s7140

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback