NY S07192 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hospital domestic violence procedures.
Title
Relates to hospital domestic violence procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Senate | signed chap.37 |
2020-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.116 |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7192 |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-05 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-02-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.387 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-22 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-02-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9134 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.116 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09134 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - signed chap.37