NY S07236 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - SIGNED CHAP.21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - SIGNED CHAP.21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the timing of the annual check of registrants.
Title
Relates to the timing of the annual check of registrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.21 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.384 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | substituted for a9128 |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2020-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.259 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09128 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - SIGNED CHAP.21