NY S07297 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 7297B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 7297B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the homeownership protection program; provides that the department of law shall establish the homeownership protection program to ensure the availability of free housing counseling and legal services to homeowners for the purposes of mitigating threats to homeownership; provides that the department of law shall provide grants to eligible not-for-profit housing counseling organizations and legal services organizations to provide services under the program.
Title
Establishes the homeownership protection program; provides that the department of law shall establish the homeownership protection program to ensure the availability of free housing counseling and legal services to homeowners for the purposes of mitigating threats to homeownership; provides that the department of law shall provide grants to eligible not-for-profit housing counseling organizations and legal services organizations to provide services under the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] |
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7297B |
2024-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7297A |
2024-01-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07636 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - print number 7636b