NY S07301 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons providing substance abuse treatment or counseling to complete training in medication assisted treatment.
Title
Requires persons providing substance abuse treatment or counseling to complete training in medication assisted treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.19 |
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.493 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.246 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a10294 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2016-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.639 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A10294 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7301