NY S07328 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to notice of determination of eligibility for medical assistance; provides for written notice and additional electronic information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to notice of determination of eligibility for medical assistance; provides for written notice and additional electronic information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.435
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-30Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-07Assemblyordered to third reading cal.807
2018-05-07Assemblysubstituted for a9004
2018-01-22Assemblyreferred to health
2018-01-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.56
2018-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09004 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7328

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback