NY S07363 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts energy efficiency standards for televisions, beginning January 1, 2011; amends definition of television and adds other, related definitions.
Title
Enacts energy efficiency standards for televisions, beginning January 1, 2011; amends definition of television and adds other, related definitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1387 | |
2010-06-30 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-03-31 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A9387 (Same As) 2010-06-03 - reported referred to rules