NY S07363 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.183
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.183
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of the general municipal law and the local finance law relating to electronic bidding until June 1, 2028.
Title
Extends certain provisions of the general municipal law and the local finance law relating to electronic bidding until June 1, 2028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.183 |
2023-06-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.556 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a7445 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1421 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7363A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2023-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A07445 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - substituted by s7363a