NY S07399 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Nicole Steinberg to apply for and receive retroactive membership in the New York teachers' retirement system.
Title
Authorizes Nicole Steinberg to apply for and receive retroactive membership in the New York teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.237 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.371 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9622 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1477 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09622 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7399