NY S07454 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to the Suffolk county judicial facilities agency.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to the Suffolk county judicial facilities agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.467 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.801 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7651 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1721 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07651 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7454