NY S07500 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.253
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.253
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Albany to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the city of Albany, county of Albany.
Title
Authorizes the county of Albany to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the city of Albany, county of Albany.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.253 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.569 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10431 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1419 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10431 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7500