NY S07509 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - SIGNED CHAP.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - SIGNED CHAP.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts into law major components of legislation which are necessary to implement the state fiscal plan for the 2020-2021 state fiscal year; extends provisions related to the financial institution data match system for state tax collection purposes; relates to serving an income execution with respect to individual tax debtors without filing a warrant (Part A); relates to extending the hire a veteran credit (Part B); relates to the effectiveness of certain oil and gas charges (Part C); relates to capping the maximum amount of the long-term care insurance credit (Part E); relates to requiring the department of taxation and finance to provide taxpayers with unclaimed tax benefits relating to the earned income credit and deductions (Part F); relates to reforming the tobacco products tax (Part H); relates to the possession of unstamped or illegally stamped cigarettes and authorizes the suspension and revocation of certain licenses and certificates related thereto (Part I); relates to the tax imposed on alcoholic beverages and the annual reporting requirements imposed on alcoholic beverage producers (Part J); relates to the excelsior jobs program and certain incentives for green projects within such program (Part L); modifies certain provisions relating to the definition of qualified film for the purposes of the empire state film production credit and the empire state film post production credit (Part M); relates to providing for the appointment of an acting director of real property tax services in the event the position becomes vacant (Part P); relates to removing references to the former STAR offset program (Part S); relates to assessment ceilings for railroads and local public utility mass real property (Part T); relates to extending the period for enrollment in the STAR income verification program (Part U); relates to financing and constructing a new equine drug testing laboratory (Part V); permits the New York state gaming commission to approve of additional locations within a casino for the operation of sports pools (Part X); relates to licenses for simulcast facilities, sums relating to track simulcast, simulcast of out-of-state thoroughbred races, simulcasting of races run by out-of-state harness tracks and distributions of wagers (Part Z); relates to extending authorization of the New York Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. to use certain funds to pay certain annual costs (Part CC).
Title
Enacts into law major components of legislation which are necessary to implement the state fiscal plan for the 2020-2021 state fiscal year; extends provisions related to the financial institution data match system for state tax collection purposes; relates to serving an income execution with respect to individual tax debtors without filing a warrant (Part A); relates to extending the hire a veteran credit (Part B); relates to the effectiveness of certain oil and gas charges (Part C); relates to capping the maximum amount of the long-term care insurance credit (Part E); relates to requiring the department of taxation and finance to provide taxpayers with unclaimed tax benefits relating to the earned income credit and deductions (Part F); relates to reforming the tobacco products tax (Part H); relates to the possession of unstamped or illegally stamped cigarettes and authorizes the suspension and revocation of certain licenses and certificates related thereto (Part I); relates to the tax imposed on alcoholic beverages and the annual reporting requirements imposed on alcoholic beverage producers (Part J); relates to the excelsior jobs program and certain incentives for green projects within such program (Part L); modifies certain provisions relating to the definition of qualified film for the purposes of the empire state film production credit and the empire state film post production credit (Part M); relates to providing for the appointment of an acting director of real property tax services in the event the position becomes vacant (Part P); relates to removing references to the former STAR offset program (Part S); relates to assessment ceilings for railroads and local public utility mass real property (Part T); relates to extending the period for enrollment in the STAR income verification program (Part U); relates to financing and constructing a new equine drug testing laboratory (Part V); permits the New York state gaming commission to approve of additional locations within a casino for the operation of sports pools (Part X); relates to licenses for simulcast facilities, sums relating to track simulcast, simulcast of out-of-state thoroughbred races, simulcasting of races run by out-of-state harness tracks and distributions of wagers (Part Z); relates to extending authorization of the New York Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. to use certain funds to pay certain annual costs (Part CC).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-31 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-31 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.59 |
2020-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | motion to amend lost |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.20 |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | substituted for a9509b |
2020-03-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-31 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2020-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.621 |
2020-03-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7509B |
2020-03-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7509A |
2020-02-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09509 (Same As) 2020-04-03 - SIGNED CHAP.59