NY S07656 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS
Pending: Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS
Pending: Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits and encourages state owned parking facilities to install solar canopies in any parking garage, open parking lot or other parking facility owned and/or operated by the state of New York, that offers parking spaces for the purposes of public use, state employee use or pay-per-usage constructed prior to January first, two thousand twenty-eight; requires such installation after January 1, 2028.
Title
Permits and encourages state owned parking facilities to install solar canopies in any parking garage, open parking lot or other parking facility owned and/or operated by the state of New York, that offers parking spaces for the purposes of public use, state employee use or pay-per-usage constructed prior to January first, two thousand twenty-eight; requires such installation after January 1, 2028.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2023-09-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7656A |
2023-09-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2023-09-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07595 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations