NY S07711 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the president of the state civil service commission to publish reports annually relating to diversity within executive state agencies, authorities, boards, bureaus, commissions, departments and divisions under executive control.
Title
Directs the president of the state civil service commission to publish reports annually relating to diversity within executive state agencies, authorities, boards, bureaus, commissions, departments and divisions under executive control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.150 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.444 |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | substituted for a8737 |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2022-01-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.39 |
2022-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08737 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - substituted by s7711