NY S07793 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 7793A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 7793A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds certain human services programs to the designated human services programs eligible for a cost of living adjustment.
Title
Adds certain human services programs to the designated human services programs eligible for a cost of living adjustment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7793A |
2024-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-12-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08437 (Same As) 2024-02-09 - print number 8437a