NY S07840 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.182 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.517 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10114 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1420 |
2014-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10114 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7840