NY S07891 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9886
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9886
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the division of minority and women's business development to accept the DD Form 214 issued by the United States department of defense upon retirement, separation, or discharge from active duty in the armed forces of the United States as proof of the race or ethnicity of an applicant and of certain personal information for purposes of certification of the applicant's business as a minority-owned business.
Title
Authorizes the division of minority and women's business development to accept the DD Form 214 issued by the United States department of defense upon retirement, separation, or discharge from active duty in the armed forces of the United States as proof of the race or ethnicity of an applicant and of certain personal information for purposes of certification of the applicant's business as a minority-owned business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9886 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2054 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09886 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.409