NY S07932 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds hazardous air quality to the state definition of a disaster; requires explicit inclusion of air quality emergency preparedness in local comprehensive emergency management plans with an action plan and annual inventory of air quality emergency resources.
Title
Adds hazardous air quality to the state definition of a disaster; requires explicit inclusion of air quality emergency preparedness in local comprehensive emergency management plans with an action plan and annual inventory of air quality emergency resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.670 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |