NY S08066 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that funding for the agrivoltaics research program shall come from appropriations made to the New York state college of agriculture and life sciences at Cornell university in chapter 53 of 2023 for the purpose of studying ecological impacts of agrivoltaics; places a sunset on such program of December 31, 2030.
Title
Provides that funding for the agrivoltaics research program shall come from appropriations made to the New York state college of agriculture and life sciences at Cornell university in chapter 53 of 2023 for the purpose of studying ecological impacts of agrivoltaics; places a sunset on such program of December 31, 2030.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.73 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.274 |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | substituted for a8496 |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2024-01-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.53 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08496 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - substituted by s8066