NY S08103 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.446
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading cal.1087
2018-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a10860
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.995
2018-03-28SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A10860 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - substituted by s8103

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback