NY S08106 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of geothermal energy systems tax credits.
Title
Increases the amount of geothermal energy systems tax credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2024-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8106A |
2024-03-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2024-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A08588 (Same As) 2024-03-19 - print number 8588a