NY S08188 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalty for the fraudulent sale of poppies, forget-me-nots, daisies, flags and other articles sold for patriotic purposes.
Title
Increases the penalty for the fraudulent sale of poppies, forget-me-nots, daisies, flags and other articles sold for patriotic purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1084 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03426 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes