NY S08198 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Governor's annual budget proposal to the Legislature shall include statements of any new legislation, amendment to legislation, or limitation on the effect of any legislation contained in the budget; makes related provisions granting the legislature an equal role with the governor in the budget process.
Title
Provides that the Governor's annual budget proposal to the Legislature shall include statements of any new legislation, amendment to legislation, or limitation on the effect of any legislation contained in the budget; makes related provisions granting the legislature an equal role with the governor in the budget process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-07-24 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-07-24 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-07-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8198A |
2020-07-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-06-05 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09100 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - to attorney-general for opinion