NY S08409 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires nonpublic schools provide and maintain on-site automatic external defibrillator (AED) equipment on school grounds and assure that AED equipment is available for off-site curricular events, extracurricular events or school-sponsored athletic events.
Title
Requires nonpublic schools provide and maintain on-site automatic external defibrillator (AED) equipment on school grounds and assure that AED equipment is available for off-site curricular events, extracurricular events or school-sponsored athletic events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
2024-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.519 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8409A |
2024-02-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2024-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09331 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - print number 9331a