NY S08497 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to amending the contribution provisions applicable to certain special plans to allow using any excess basic or additional member contributions to offset any deficits in such other contribution account prior to the date of retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to amending the contribution provisions applicable to certain special plans to allow using any excess basic or additional member contributions to offset any deficits in such other contribution account prior to the date of retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.448
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.191
2018-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a10696
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1396
2018-05-09SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10696 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8497

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback