NY S08647 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for tax exemption applications for tax assessments for certain improved properties affected by Superstorm Sandy from March 1, 2020 until March 1, 2022.
Title
Extends the deadline for tax exemption applications for tax assessments for certain improved properties affected by Superstorm Sandy from March 1, 2020 until March 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.259 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.938 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8647 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.196 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.196 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9968 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.938 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-06-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09968 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.259