NY S08744 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the crime of adultery.
Title
Repeals the crime of adultery.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4714 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.736 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04714 (Same As) 2024-04-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY