NY S08805 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - APPROVAL MEMO.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that all increased payments for salary adjustments according to plan and step-ups or increments during a wage freeze be suspended; makes such provisions applicable to county employees and employees of covered organizations, whether or not they are covered by a collectively negotiated agreement; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that all increased payments for salary adjustments according to plan and step-ups or increments during a wage freeze be suspended; makes such provisions applicable to county employees and employees of covered organizations, whether or not they are covered by a collectively negotiated agreement; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.5
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.355
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.414
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10670
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1654
2018-05-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10670 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8805

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback