NY S08832 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to the Jaam'e Masjid Bellmore LI Inc. for the 2015-2016 and the 2016-2017 assessment rolls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to the Jaam'e Masjid Bellmore LI Inc. for the 2015-2016 and the 2016-2017 assessment rolls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.451
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.350
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10316a
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1974
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-05-23SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10316 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8832

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback