NY S08889 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9328B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9328B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain funds received by the New York state energy research and development authority that are related to renewables development on viable agricultural lands to be used for farmland protection programs; establishes the agricultural and farmland viability protection fund.
Title
Requires certain funds received by the New York state energy research and development authority that are related to renewables development on viable agricultural lands to be used for farmland protection programs; establishes the agricultural and farmland viability protection fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9328B |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1905 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8889A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09328 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - signed chap.652