NY S08934 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to the definition of the weapon designated as a "throwing star" or "shuriken"; updates such term from the outdated term "Kung Fu star" to reflect such term's correct etymology.
Title
Makes technical corrections to the definition of the weapon designated as a "throwing star" or "shuriken"; updates such term from the outdated term "Kung Fu star" to reflect such term's correct etymology.
Sponsors
Sen. Iwen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.791 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08425 (Same As) 2024-03-11 - REFERRED TO CODES