NY S08972 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9749B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9749B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any electronic benefit transfer services for supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP) benefits shall ensure that two electronic benefit transfer credit or debit cards are issued for use by any recipient household having more than one parent or guardian residing in the household on a full-time basis.
Title
Requires that any electronic benefit transfer services for supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP) benefits shall ensure that two electronic benefit transfer credit or debit cards are issued for use by any recipient household having more than one parent or guardian residing in the household on a full-time basis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9749B |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1695 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8972A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A09749 (Same As) 2022-07-14 - signed chap.376