NY S09191 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the right to strike as an employee right.
Title
Includes the right to strike as an employee right.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-05-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09115 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary