NY S50016 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of the sale of bonds and notes of the city of NY; NYS financial emergency act; interest rate exchange agreements and refunding of bonds.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of the sale of bonds and notes of the city of NY; NYS financial emergency act; interest rate exchange agreements and refunding of bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-23 | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE | |
2009-06-23 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.4 | |
2009-06-23 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
S5529 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.184
A8616 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.184
S60425 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65024 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
A8616 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.184
S60425 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65024 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES