OH HB11 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-19 - Effective 10/19/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-19 - Effective 10/19/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 141.13, 141.16, 2151.07, 2301.02, and 2301.03 of the Revised Code to create a domestic relations division of the Delaware County Court of Common Pleas, to create a judgeship for that division, to require payments to retired assigned judges under certain specified circumstances, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Creates domestic relations court in Delaware County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-19 | Effective 10/19/15 | |
2015-09-30 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Emergency Features Stood |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported: Civil Justice |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-17 | House | Passed |
2015-03-04 | House | Reported: Judiciary |
2015-01-29 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 41 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 41 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 51 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 01 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |