OH HB123 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2305.25 and 2305.252 and to enact section 5164.94 of the Revised Code regarding health care peer review committee proceedings and Medicaid coverage of telehealth services.
Title
Regarding health care peer review committee proceedings and Medicaid coverage of telehealth services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Effective Date | |
2014-02-18 | Governor' Action | |
2014-02-25 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-02-13 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-01-29 | Concurrence | |
2014-01-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-12-04 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-06-27 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-06-27 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-06-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-04-10 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-04-10 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
17 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 39 | 051 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 51 | 69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 05 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 252 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
39 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 23 | 235 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
51 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 11 | 0216 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 64 | 94 | New Code | See Bill Text |