OH HB156 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Effective 3/20/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Effective 3/20/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1739.05, 1753.09, 3901.21, 3963.01, 3963.02, 3963.03, 4725.19, and 4731.22 and to enact sections 1751.85 and 3923.86 of the Revised Code regarding limitations imposed by health insurers on vision care services.
Title
Address vision care insurance limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Effective 3/20/19 | |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-27 | House | Passed |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2017-05-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 39 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 51 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 53 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 23 | 86 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 63 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 63 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 63 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 25 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |