OH HB215 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Refer to Committee: Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Refer to Committee: Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 959.15 and 959.99 of the Revised Code to prohibit and establish an increased penalty for knowingly engaging in activities associated with cockfighting, bearbaiting, or pitting an animal against another.
Title
Increases penalty associated with animal fighting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported - Amended: Judiciary |
2015-05-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2015-05-18 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture : Animals
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Agriculture : Animals
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 59 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 59 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |